Aaron v. Cano et al
Plaintiff: George Aaron, Jr.
Defendant: S. Cano, I. Bueno and L. Cano
Case Number: 1:2008cv00664
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CLOSING CASE In Light of 48 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Order For Action To Proceed On October 21, 2009 Amended Complaint Against Defendants I. Bueno, L. Cano, And S. Cano For Retaliation (Doc. 32 ); signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2010. (Fahrney, E)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/28/2010 recommending that certain claims be DISMISSED re 26 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by George Aaron, Jr. (Objections to F&R due by 8/30/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING 15 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING 28 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/4/2010. (Bradley, A)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Plaintiff to File, Within Thirty Days of the Date of Service of this Order, a Response to this Order, indicating whether he Intends to File an Amended Complaint or Proceed on the Original Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/21/2009. Response to Order due by 9/28/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Cano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Aaron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Bueno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?