Pettus v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons et al

Plaintiff: Nakia Pettus
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Prisons and D. Smith
Case Number: 1:2008cv00741
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE Filing Fees 81 , signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/12: Plaintiff still owes the Court an outstanding balance of $13.27. (Hellings, J)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting Defendant Smith's Motion For Summary Judgment And Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/23/2010. The parties have filed cross motions for summary judgment. For the reasons that follow, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 59 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 67 ) is DENIED. CASE CLOSED. (Scrivner, E)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 46 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 02/16/2010. (Flores, E)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REQUIRING Supplemental Brief signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/2009. Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the Court within 30 (thirty) days of this Order as to all of the steps he has undertaken to seek formal review of the issues remaining in his case within the BoP grievance process. Filing Deadline: 12/21/2009. (Bradley, A)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Re Defendant's Motion to Stay 47 , signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/31/09: The Court hereby GRANTS both parties an additional sixty (60) days from the ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in which to prepare and file any motions for summary judgment. (Hellings, J)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 23 Motion for Concurrent Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/13/2009. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettus v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia Pettus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smith
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?