Sons v. McManis

Plaintiff: Bruce Lynn Sons
Defendant: Jim McManis
Case Number: 1:2008cv00840
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Theresa A. Goldner
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 23:1441 Contract Real Estate

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing Clerk to Enter Judgment in Favor of Defendant, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM, OPINION And ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. 49 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2010. (Scrivner, E)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER vacating hearing date of August 23, 2010 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/18/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/14/2011; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/14/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroo m 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) re 12 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/2010. Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs first claim for relief for breach of fiduciary duty is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs first cl aim for relief is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claim for relief for breach of contract is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs second claim for relief is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claim for relief for unjust enrichment is DENIED. Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claim for relief for fraud is DENIED. (Bradley, A)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER vacating hearing date of August 10, 2009 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/09. (Nazaroff, H)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule and Limited Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/24/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING 12 Motion for More Definite Statement; Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's fourth claim for relief is GRANTED; Plaintiff's fourth claim is DISMISSED with leave to amend, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/02/2009. (Martin, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sons v. McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lynn Sons
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?