Oba Lee Frelimo v. J. Garcia, et al
Plaintiff: Oba Lee Frelimo
Defendant: J. Garcia, A. Trujillo, M. Martinez and G. Smith
Case Number: 1:2008cv01040
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/29/2011. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED approving the parties stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and fees. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/13/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/6/2010 at 03:30 PM, Arizona Time, before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee.(Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 Request for Continuance, VACATING the telephonic status conference scheduled for September 28, 2010 at 2 p.m., and SETTING a telephonic status conference before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee for Tuesday, October 12, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. Arizona time signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 9/24/2010. (Bradley, A)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Status Conference before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee for Tuesday September 28, 2010 at 2 p.m. Arizona time signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 9/21/2010. (Bradley, A)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Payment of Service Fees Incurred with Serving G. Smith in the amount of $250.25 will be DEFERRED to the Conclusion of the Case signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/4/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 31 REQUEST for Order Reimbursing U.S. Marshal Service Fees signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 4/16/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the California Department of Corrections has the option to pay the service fees to the U.S. Marshal now, or alternatively, to defer the costs to the conclusion of the case when judgment is entered. The California Department of Corrections shall inform the Court of its election by April 30, 2010. (Bradley, A)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/9/10. (Hellings, J)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee for 3/9/2010 at 02:30 PM Arizona Time signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/16/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/7/2009. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday 12/15/2009 at 03:00 PM, Arizona Time before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Sant Agata, S)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/7/2009, The Court advises the parties that the Court is conducting statutory screening. The matter will proceed following the issuance of the statutory screening order. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oba Lee Frelimo v. J. Garcia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oba Lee Frelimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?