Lewis v. City Of Fresno, et al.
Plaintiff: James Lewis
Defendant: City Of Fresno, Jerry Dyer, Robert Nevarez, John Romo, Greg Garner and Anthony Martinez
Case Number: 1:2008cv01062
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/21/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re Motions in Limine as to Ron Manning, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/5/2011. (Kusamura, W)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT on Behalf of the City of Fresno, Jerry Dyer, Kirk Pool, Jason Jones and Brett Vestal in the Pierro Action, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. (Jessen, A)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 74 , 105 ) in the Pierro Action on Behalf of Defendants City of Fresno, Jerry Dyer, Kirk Pool, Jason Jones and Brett Vestal [FRCP 56, Local Rule 56-260], Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/15/2011. (Arellano, S.)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and Conference, and Telephonic Appearance, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/14/2011. (Kusamura, W)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue settlement conference. The Settlement Conference currently set for 7/12/2011, is CONTINUED to 7/28/2011, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/7/2011. (Timken, A)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/13/2011. (Timken, A)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Amending Schedule Regarding Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/17/2011. (Plaintiffs oppositions to the Motions for Summary Judgment are to be filed no later than 6/6/2011. Any reply to the oppositions shall b e filed no later than 6/13/2011. Hearing on the Motions for Summary Judgment will be continued to 6/20/2011 at 10:00AM before the Honorable Oliver W. Wanger, in Courtroom 3, 7th Floor. All other dates and times set forth in the Second Amended Scheduling Order remain the same.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION 68 and ORDER to Dismiss Certain Claims and Individual Defendants Jerry Dyer, Roger Enmark, Robert Nevarez, Joyce Vasquez, Eric Eide and Mindy Medina-Casto by Plaintiff Ron Manning, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/20/11. (Verduzco, M)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing settlement conference. The Settlement Conference currently set for 3/29/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/12/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/2011. (Timken, A)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/3/2011. The Status Conference now set for 3/11/2011 is CONTINUED to 4/1/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Arellano, S.)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, for More Definite Statement, and to Strike, and DIRECTING Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/3/09: First Amended Complaint due by 9/24/2009.(Hellings, J)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Lead case is 1:08-cv-1062 OWW GSA, Member Case is 1:09-cv-0304 LJO SMS; MEMBER CASE CLOSED; all future filings to be made in Lead Case signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/8/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM DECISION Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Actions 29 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/6/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue 7 23 MOTION to DISMISS Complaint; currently set for 4/27/2009 is moved to 7/13/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/22/2009. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. City Of Fresno, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lewis
Represented By: Rayma Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Dyer
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nevarez
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Romo
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Garner
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Martinez
Represented By: Shannon L. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?