Rollins v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Elliott Eugene Rollins
Defendant: Derral G. Adams, Jose Guzman, Doug Sullivan and G. Gomez
Case Number: 1:2008cv01212
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 22 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings signed by District Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 02/10/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion to modify the scheduling order, signed by District Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 07/19/2010. (Martin, S)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Plaintiff Shall File an Opposition to the 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by District Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 06/21/2010. Opposition due by 7/16/2010. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Plaintiff may submit an additional filing within 15 days of this Order. If no additional filing is submitted, the Court will rule upon the motion to dismiss based on the present record signed by District Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 02/17/2010. Opposition due by 3/8/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollins v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Eugene Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?