Arnold v. La Quinta Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Defendant: La Quinta Corporation, LQ Management, LLC and IC Kang Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv01246
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Case signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/2011. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER continuing hearing on Motion for attorney's fees from August 22, 2011 to October 17, 2011 at 1:30 before Judge Anthony W. Ishii in courtroom #2 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension to File a Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses and Costs, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/3/11: Motion ddl CONTINUED from May 13, 2011 to July 12, 2011. (Hellings, J)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER for Settlement of Plaintiff's Claims for Damages as against Defendant, IC Kang Corporation signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/12/2011.(Lundstrom, T)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CONSENT DECREE and ORDER for Settlement of Plaintiff's Claims for Damages and Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses and Costs as Against Liberty Hotel Investments LP, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/28/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES - Deadline to Complete Non Expert Discovery to 1/24/2011; Disclose Expert Witnesses to 1/31/2011; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses NO CHANGE, Shall remain as previously set of 2/14/2011; Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery 3/16/2011; Dispositive Motions filed by 4/15/2011; Hearing 6/6/2011; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 4/15/2011; Hearing 5/13/2011; Deadline to disclosure of all witnesses to be called in each party's case in chief by 6/10/2011; Pretri al Conference set for 8/17/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 10/4/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/29/2010. (Hernandez, M)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Pre-Trial Deadlines and Trial Dates signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/1/2010. (Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 12/17/2010; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/14/2011; Filing Deadline: 2/14/2011 ; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/18/2011; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 3/18/2011; Discovery due by 3/29/2011; Non-Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 4/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck; Dispositive M otions Hearing set for 4/25/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 8/2/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CONSENT DECREE and ORDER for Settlement of Injunctive Relief Only signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/20/2010. (Flores, E)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER re extension of deadlines set forth in scheduling order. Discovery pertaining to experts continued from 10/1/2009 to 10/16/2009. Disclosure of expert witnesses continued from 8/3/2009 to 9/14/2009. Disclosure of all supplement al experts continued from 9/1/2009 to 9/28/2009. Filing of Non-Dispositive Motions continued from 9/16/2009 to 9/30/2009. Filing of Dispositive motions continued from 9/25/2009 to 10/23/2009. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/21/2009. (Hernandez, M)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STRIKING 27 January 28, 2009 Filing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/18/2009. (Sondheim, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. La Quinta Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Represented By: Jordon Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC Kang Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?