Maxwell v. MortgageIT, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samuel Maxwell
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc., Union Fidelity Mortgage, Inc., Erin Reilly and Randolph Martin
Case Number: 1:2008cv01329
Filed: September 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Request for Dismissal and ORDER Dismissing Action, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/2/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Finding Good Faith Settlement And Barring Further Claims For Indemnity or Contribution as Against Defendant Mortgage IT Inc., signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/7/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION Re: 39 Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/1/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MortgageIT, Inc.'s request for a waiver of attendance at the settlement conference currently noticed for 5/25/2010; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/2010. (Rooney, M)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/11/2010 dismissing Defendant, Erin Reilly with prejudice. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 COURTROOM DECORUM. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER on Defendant MortgageIT, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, Motion for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/18/09: 1) Motion to Dismiss 10 is DENIED; 2) Motion for a More Definite Statement 10 is DENIED; Motion to Strike 9 is GRANTED. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. MortgageIT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A Braje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Fidelity Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A Braje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Reilly
Represented By: Keith M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Martin
Represented By: Karen A Braje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Maxwell
Represented By: Shane Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?