Phillips v. Turmezei et al
Plaintiff: Donnie R Phillips
Defendant: Timothy Turmezei, A Murphy, Kelli Hammond, N. Grannis, W. J. Sullivan, J Gentry, N Verdin, - Holland, Petterson, - Hill and - - Tucker
Case Number: 1:2008cv01388
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 80 Motion to Vacate, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 4/11/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 2/23/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 2/1/11: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply 70 is GRANTED; Defendants' Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order 75 is DENIED. The parties shall have to and including April 4, 2011, to file a joint proposed pretrial statement. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 12/20/2010. Motion to Compel 51 granted in part and denied in part. (Verduzco, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request to File Exhibit B to the 52 Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 12/8/2010. (Jessen, A)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to File a Response to 52 Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 12/7/2010. Plaintiff's Response due by 12/23/2010. (Jessen, A)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTNG 47 Motion to Modify the Schedule, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 10/07/2010. (Murphy's Initial Disclosures and Expert Disclosures due 09/15/2010; Discovery due 10/30/2010; All parties shall have to 10/30/2010 to comply with paragraph 6 of the Scheduling Order 35 and the Dispositive motion cutoff date is extended to 11/30/2010) (Martin, S)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Directing Service by USM on Defendant Murphy, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 08/03/2010. (Documents to be served by US Marshal: First Amended Complaint 19 ; Order 21 , dated 06/22/2009; Order 33 , dated 01/27/2010 and this order(Service must be done within (20) days of the date of this order and Return of Service Deadline: 9/7/2010) (Martin, S) (Copies of the above mentioned documents along with this order forwarded to US Marshal-Sacramento)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 40 Motion for Court Order for Service signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 6/30/2010. (Marrujo, C)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 3/25/2010. Plaintiff is notified that this matter will be dismissed as to defendant, A. Murphy, in ten days of the docketing of this order if plaintiff fails to show good cause before that date for his failure to serve the summons and complaint. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2010. (Bradley, A)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENIED IN PART to the entent it seeks reconsideration of the Court's June 22 and September 17, 2009 Orders; DENIED IN PART to the extent it seeks a certification pursuant to 28 USC 1292; GRANTED IN PART to the extent it seeks clarification of the provision in the Court's September 17, 2009 Order 25 Motion, signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 01/26/2010. (Martin, S)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Motion/Request for Endorsed Copy of Complaint 17 , signed by District Judge Frederick J. Martone on 4/3/09. (Encl: Conformed Copy of Complaint 1 ) (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Turmezei et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Turmezei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Verdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - - Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?