Beverly v. Federal Elections Commission

Plaintiff: Arnold Dewalt Beverly
Defendant: Federal Elections Commission
Case Number: 1:2008cv01538
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Voting Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment as Independent Prosecutory 37 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/5/09. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Closing Case 18 21 29 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/27/09. (Hellings, J)
January 22, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of January 26, 2009 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/21/09. (Nazaroff, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly v. Federal Elections Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Dewalt Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Elections Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?