Pinzon v. Jensen et al
Plaintiff: Abraham G. Pinzon
Defendant: Ron Jensen, Jensen Construction, Superior Court of CA, Dan Vaughn and Pinecrest Market
Case Number: 1:2008cv01543
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING CASE For Lack Of Prosecution, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/19/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Hearing and Ordering additional filings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2013. (Kusamura, W)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER VACATING the 3/4/2013 hearing re dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to make additional filings within 21 days that further the prosecution of his case. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2013. (Rooney, M)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING 83 Plaintiff's motion to amend and to assign legal counsel. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/20/2012. (Timken, A)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER VACATING the 2/21/2012 hearing on dismissal for lack of prosecution set before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and FURTHER DENYING plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration, documents 84 and 85 . Plaintiff's Motion to Amend will be addressed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/16/2012. (Rooney, M)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER vacating Pretrial of 8/31/2011 and trial date of October 25, 2011. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/26/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 55 , 68 ), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/12/2011. (Arellano, S.)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER PERMITTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING and GRANTING leave to plaintiff to file opposition to the pending summary judgment motions, documents 55 and 68 , which opposition is due by 6/30/2011, and defendants a reply date of 7/8/2011, and FURTHER VACATING the 6/20/2011 hearing on said motions for summary judgment; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/13/2011. (Rooney, M)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER vacating hearing date of May 23, 2011 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/19/11. (Nazaroff, H)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING 67 Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/18/2011. (Timken, A)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/29/2011. (Timken, A)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of a Special Master signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/9/2011. (Timken, A)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STRIKING Dan Vaughn's motion for summary judgment. (2/28 hearing vacated) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/24/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 1/6/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/23/2010. (Rooney, M)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 36 Motion for Default Judgment Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/11/2010. (Esteves, C)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: Motion to Dismiss 18 , 21 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/20/09: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiff is not granted leave to amend. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER vacating hearing date of September 28, 2009 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/24/09. (Nazaroff, H)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2009. Amended Complaint due by 3/5/2009. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinzon v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham G. Pinzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jensen Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinecrest Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?