Fresquez v. Mercy Hospital Bakersfield et al
Plaintiff: Louis Richard Fresquez
Defendant: Mercy Hospital Bakersfield, Cardionucular Laboratory, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, SATF Health Care Services and Beregovskaya
Case Number: 1:2008cv01699
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice for Failure to Pay Filing Fee, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/15/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Marrujo, C)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/30/10: Plaintiff's deadline to submit the $350.00 filing fee EXTENDED to 5/3/2010. (Hellings, J)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion for a Stay; ORDER DENYING 10 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; and ORDER GRANTING an Extension of Time to File Response signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/7/2009. ( Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2009) (Figueroa, O)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING First Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 1/5/09: Show Cause Response ddl EXTENDED to 2/9/2009. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresquez v. Mercy Hospital Bakersfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Richard Fresquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital Bakersfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardionucular Laboratory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATF Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beregovskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?