Michael James v. James A. Yates
Plaintiff: Michael A James
Defendant: James A. Yates
Case Number: 1:2008cv01706
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISREGARDING 24 Plaintiff's Motion; ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (Strike) With Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/15/2010. CASE CLOSED. Dismissal counts as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(G). (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Request For Entry Of Default And Default Judgment (Doc. 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/2/2009. (Scrivner, E)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's First Motion to File Amended Complaint 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/21/09: Amended Complaint ddl EXTENDED to 5/26/2009. (Hellings, J)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Remand signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/2009. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael James v. James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Represented By: Phillip L. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?