Garcia v. Evans

Petitioner: Francisco Orosco Garcia
Respondent: M. S. Evans
Case Number: 1:2008cv01819
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CJA 20 ORDER appointing Attorney Carolyn Phillips for Francisco Orosco Garcia signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 59 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/30/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 56 Petitoner's Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/27/12. (Verduzco, M)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion to Stay 43 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/6/12. (Gonzalez, R)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re: Petitioner's 43 MOTION to STAY, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/20/11. Petitioner's Supplemental Briefing Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 34 Motion to File Supplemental Objections to Findings and Recommendations and Motion For Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 12/20/2010. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 8/2/2010. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Regarding Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus 1 , Objections Due Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 6/1/2010. The Court RECOMMENDS that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be DENIED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to enter judgment for Respondent. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/6/2010. (Scrivner, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Orosco Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. S. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?