Quintero v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Esteban Quintero
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2008cv01890
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1391 Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION Regarding Motions to Amend Judgment 61 66 70 74 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/2/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CORRECTED AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Plaintiff Leticia Quintero, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/11. (Verduzco, M)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Memorandum Decision regarding Motions to Amend Judgment 61 66 70 74 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/6/2010. (Figueroa, O)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT dated *7/19/2010* in favor of Esteban Quintero and Leticia Quintero against United States of America pursuant to order. (Scrivner, E)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW Following Bench Trial, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2010. (Arellano, S.)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 COURTROOM DECORUM (Gaumnitz, R)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulation and ORDER to Consolidate Cases and Modify Case Schedule signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/28/2009 and filed in case 1:09-cv-01332 OWW SMS. Discovery cutoff 1/22/2010; Non-dispositive motion filing deadline 1/4/2010; Settlement conference TBD. All further filings shall be made in Case No. 1:08-cv-01890 OWW SMS. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Quintero
Represented By: Christopher Walter Lampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?