Ramon Reymundo v. James Hartley
Plaintiff: Ramon Reymundo
Defendant: James Hartley and Roland A. Huerta
Case Number: 1:2008cv01900
Filed: December 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendations And Granting Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (Docs. 28 , 34 ), signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/6/2011. (Fahrney, E)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 28 Motion to Dismiss be Granted; Objections Due Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/3/2011. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 8/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/19/11. (Verduzco, M)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims: This action proceed on Plaintiffs complaint, filed December 1, 2008, against Defendants Bouhaben and Roland for violation of the Eighth Amendment; and Defendants A. Huerta and James Hartley are DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. James Hartley and Huerta terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/1/2010. (Marrujo, C)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Either Notify the Court In Writing That He Wishes to Proceed Only on Claims Found to be Cognizable OR File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/16/2009. Notice or Second Amended Complaint due by 10/13/2009. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramon Reymundo v. James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Reymundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A. Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?