Jones v. New Century Mortgage Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Jones
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corp., U.S. National Bank Association and Chase Home Finance
Case Number: 1:2008cv01994
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2009. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Second INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2008. (Esteves, C)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2009. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. New Century Mortgage Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. National Bank Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?