Palacios v. Nunez, et al.
Plaintiff: Gloria Palacios
Defendant: Henry D. Nunez and William F. Hancock, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01996
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CLOSING CASE Due to Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER DENYING Pending Motions as Moot, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Sondheim, M)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER vacating hearing date of January 4, 2010 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/22/2009. (Nazaroff, H)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to File Plaintiff's Ex Parte Request for ADA Accommodation to Meaningful Access to Court; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to File UNDER SEAL the Five Pages of Medical Documentation and Correspondence Submitted With the Ex Parte Request for Accommodation; INFORMATIONAL ORDER to Plaintiff Regarding Consideration of the Request for Accommodation at the Hearing on an Order to Show Cause Presently Set for August 21, 2009, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/14/09. (Hellings, J)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to personally appear and SHOW CAUSE Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/10/2009. Plaintiff Must PERSONALLY APPEAR on Friday, August 21, 2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Show Cause Response, if any, due August 14, 2009. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palacios v. Nunez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry D. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Hancock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?