Fordjour v. Jordan, et al.
Petitioner: Charles Fordjour
Respondent: Chris Jordan, Edmund G. Brown and State of California
Case Number: 1:2009cv00060
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Dismiss The Petition As Moot And To Decline To Issue A Certificate Of Appealability (Doc. 1 ), Objections Due Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/2010. It is RECOMMENDED that: The petition be DISMISSED as moot. The Court DECLINE to issue a certificate of appealablity; and The Clerk be DIRECTED to close the action. F&R's referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 10/7/2010. (Scrivner, E)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DENYING Petitioners motions for immediate release, immediate release on his own recognizance, issuance of an order to show cause, and injunctive relief re: 6 & 7 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2010. (Marrujo, C)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSTRUING THE PETITION AS 28 U.S.C. § 2241; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/28/2010. (Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendations Dated June 8, 2009 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/1/10. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fordjour v. Jordan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Fordjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?