Glass v. Woodford et al
Plaintiff: Donald Glass
Defendant: J. S. Woodford, Bill Lockyer, Robert Santos, A.K. Scribner, L. Watson, D.D. Sheppard-Brooks, V. Yamamoto, R.R. Lowden, R. Halberg, R. Lopez, R. Fields, Mason, A. Diaz, D.D. Ortiz, D. Indendi, J. Keener, S. Grandy, L.L. Wood, S Oehlert, B. Riddle, A. Trudillo, E. Hamilton, J Bautista, Logue, - Robles, V. Cedillos, F. Braswell, J.M. Gonzales, W. Hayward, A. Olivas, M. Hodge-Wilkins, C.K. Lawence, Poblete, L. McDaniel, J. Kim, B. Silva, D. Combs and D - Matthews
Case Number: 1:2009cv00098
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER DENYING as MOOT Plaintiff's 269 Motion for Court Order Directing Clerk of the Court to Mail Unused Witness Fees and Travel Expenses, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING Issuance of Writ of Execution, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/2/13. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE and ORDER That Witness DONALD GLASS, CDC# D-54799, is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/23/13. (Hellings, J)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER REQUIRING Production of Plaintiff for Trial on April 19, 2013 at 8:00 A.M., signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/13. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER REQUIRING Production of Plaintiff for Trial on April 18, 2013 at 8:00 a.m., signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/17/13. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE and ORDER that Witness Lamont E. Rencher D-97733, is No Longer Needed as Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER DENYING of Plaintiff's 203 & 205 Motions for Subpoena Duces, Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum and All Writs Act; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Relief From Pretrial Order Requiring Submission of Four Pre-Marked Copies of His Proposed Trial Exhibits 155 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/28/2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport ERIC JACKSON, CDC #D-47735 on April 16, 2013 at 8:30 a.m., before Judge Ishii, Courtroom #2, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/20/13. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/13: Defendants' request is GRANTED; The deadline for the Defendants to file motions in limine is April 1, 2013. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff Donald Glass, CDC# D-54799, is No Longer Needed as Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/14/13. (Verduzco, M)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED ORDER setting Settlement Conference re 170 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/26/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify the Court Whether they will Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within Ten Days; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Send Consent Forms to Parties signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/15/2013. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2013 denying 146 Motion requesting court order to allow Plaintiff to file extensions of time, replies or objections without prejudice and denying 147 Request for Judicial Notice as moot.(Lundstrom, T)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit Fees for the Attendance of Unincarcerated Witnesses 140 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/18/13: Plaintiff shall have an additional 21-days from the date of service of this order to submit money orders for Chief Deputy Warden Lonnie Watson and Lieutenant Daniel Indendi. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DIRECTING Service of Subpoenas on Witnesses By The United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs (Service Within 7 Days), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/13: The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward docum ents to the United States Marshal as follows: Three completed issued subpoenas to be served on Facility Captain R. Halberg, Facility Captain R. Lopez and Radiologist Tsung-Yi Stephen Huo; Three (3) completed USM-285 Forms; Three (3) Money Orders, each in the amount of $100.17, made payable to witnesses listed above; and Four (4) copies of this order, one to accompany each subpoena, plus an extra copy for the Marshal.(Hellings, J)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Denying Motion For Subpoena Duces Tecum (ECF No. 114 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/20/2012. (Fahrney, E)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING in Part Plaintiff's 113 Motion for the Attendance of Unincarcerated Witnesses, by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2012. Deadline to Submit Witness Fees: January 11, 2013. (Marrujo, C)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Addressing Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/2012. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 111 Defendants' First Motion to Extend Time to Notify Court Whether Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2012. Notice due within seven (7) days. (Jessen, A)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial TWENTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/12. (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 55 , 100 , 107 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/13/12: This action is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Grandy for Failure to Effect Service of Process signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/2012. S. Grandy terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 55 , 86 , 87 , 88 , 91 , 92 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/22/12. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/25/2012. (Flores, E)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 82 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 65 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc and STRIKING 94 Objections; This action is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/22/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Injunctive Relief be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/1/2012. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 1/26/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Grandy Should not be Dismissed From This Action for Failure to Effect Service of Process, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/11. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Summary Judgment 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/6/11. Opposition due within sixty days.(Verduzco, M)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Amend the Scheduling Order 39 , 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/11. (Verduzco, M)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Dismissing Doe Defendants, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/31/11. (Verduzco, M)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE 19 , 26 , signed by District Judge Christina A. Snyder on 4/6/2011. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 20 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/7/2010. M. Hodge-Wilkins, A. Olivas, C.K. Lawence, Poblete, J. Kim, Mason, Bill Lockyer, Billiou, A. Diaz, Robert Santos, J. S. Woodford, B. Silva, D.D. Shepp ard-Brooks, R.R. Lowden, S. Issac, S. Pina, J. Keener, D. Indendi, Warren, J.M. Gonzales, W. Hayward, Dehlert, F. Braswell, A. Trudillo, L.L. Wood, A.K. Scribner, L. Watson, D.D. Ortiz, V. Yamamoto, R. Lopez, R. Halberg, D. Combs, D - Matthews are DISMISSED from this action.(Verduzco, M)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:09-cv-0019 CMK PC) to Fresno 1:09-cv-0098 DLB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/14/09. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. S. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lockyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.D. Sheppard-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Lowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Indendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Grandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Oehlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Trudillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Cedillos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hodge-Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.K. Lawence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poblete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D - Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?