Garcia v. City of Sanger et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Garcia
Defendant: City of Sanger, City of Sanger Police Department and Manuel Chavez
Case Number: 1:2009cv00359
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Dismissing Claims Pursuant to Parties Stipulation and Settlement, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/24/11. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/16/2010. (Timken, A)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RESETTING date of mandatory settlment conference. The Settlement Conference currently set for 11/17/2010 is CONTINUED to 11/30/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/2/2010. (Timken, A)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Designate Expert Witnesses signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/14/2010. (Esteves, C)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for New Discovery cut-off, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2010. (Kusamura, W)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO COMPEL Plaintiff's Responses To Request For Production Of Documents, Set One And Special Interrogatories, Set One Propounded By City Of Sanger And Sanger Police Department, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/11/2010. Plaintiff is compelled to provide complete written responses, without objections, within 10 days from the signing of this order (5/21/2010). (Gaumnitz, R)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER to STIPULATION for Filing of Third Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/14/2009. Third Amended Complaint due by 11/2/2009. Defendants' Answer due by 11/12/2009. (Sondheim, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. City of Sanger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Garcia
Represented By: Juan Manuel Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sanger
Represented By: Lori R. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sanger Police Department
Represented By: Lori R. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Chavez
Represented By: Lori R. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?