Carlin et al v. DairyAmerica, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Carlin, John Rahm, Paul Rozwadowski and Bryan Wolfe
Defendant: DairyAmerica, Inc. and California Dairies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00430
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE OBJECTORS' NOTICE OF APPEAL 592 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/11/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Doc. No. 592) is GRANTED. The notice of appeal signed by Mr. Haar (Doc. No. 588) is STRICKEN. (Gonzales, V)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER ON PARTIES' MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/08/2019. (Gonzales, V)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO SETTLEMENT CLASSW MEMBERS IN FEDERAL MILK MARKETING ORDER 30. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion is taken under submission as of today and is GRANTED, and the January 14, 2019 hearing is vacated. Within seven days of this Order, (a) the Supplemental Notice and the Claim Form to Settlement Class Members whosold raw milk priced according to the Upper Midwest Federal Milk MarketingOrder 30 will be sent, in accordance wi th Exhibits A and B to the motion; and (b) the settlement website will be updated to provide information related to this issue and the Supplemental Notice. All other dates related to settlement class notice and final approval of settlement remain unchanged as set out in the November 2, 2018 Order (ECF No. 564). Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/13/2018. (Timken, A)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER GRANTING unopposed motion to extend deadlines for class notice and final approval of settlement, 563 . The date of the hearing to determine the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the proposed settlement with DairyAmeric a and California Dairies and whether to approve Class Counsel's request for attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses and service awards for Class Representatives, is rescheduled from March 4, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., to March 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/2/2018. (Timken, A)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER GRANTING 560 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Escrow Agent and to Extend Date by when Defendants are to Pay First Settlement Payment-Installment. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/2/2018. (Timken, A)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT - Final Settlement Approval Hearing set for 3/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/2018. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 9/14/2018 (Kusamura, W). (Main Document 559 replaced on 9/14/2018) (Kusamura, W).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Document and File Redacted Version. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a redacted version of the Confidential Side Letter, attached as Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of the Un opposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement on the public docket. Plaintiffs will email the unredacted version of the document to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov for filing under seal. Only the parties' counsel of record, the Court and its staff shall have access to the unredacted document. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/13/2018. (Timken, A)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying the scheduling order, document 547 , as follows: 1) The deadline for the parties to complete document productions shall be extended to May 1, 2018; and 2) The deadline for DairyAmerica to file a Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of the Magistrate Judge's Ruling Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel shall be extended to May 1, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/20178. (Rooney, M)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Order Modifying Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/26/2018. (Completion of Documents Production: 4/12/2018; Completion of Depositions: 8/13/2018; Contention Interrogatory Response: 9/10/2018; Motion for Class cert ification and Motions for Summary Judgment filed by 9/24/2018; Expert Disclosure due by 9/24/2018; Oppositions to Motion for Class Certification and Motions for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/30/2018; Reply b riefs supporting Motion for Class Certification and Motions for Summary Judgment due by 1/25/2019; Motion for Class Certification Hearing previously set for 1/11/2019 has been CONTINUED to 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING an extension of the deadline for DairyAmerica to file a Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of the Magistrate Judge's Ruling Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 542 ) to February 26, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/2018. (Rooney, M)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER following discovery dispute conference and granting plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, document 532 , with the following parameters: 1) a. The production shall be limited to records concerning Non-Fat Dairy Milk or Skim Milk Powder from the date range of the class period, January 1, 2002, through April 30, 2007; and b. The production need not include accounts payable or payroll records; 2) DairyAmerica's objection to the deposition of Henry Heerlyn is moot based on agreement among the parties; 3) California Dairies' objection to the number of depositions sought by Plaintiffs as not proportional to the needs of the case is overruled; 4) California Dairies' objections to the depositions of Jim Gomes and Christine Edwa rds are moot based on agreement among the parties; 5) California Dairies' objection to the deposition of Duane Matheron is overruled; 6) California Dairies' objection to the deposition of Alma Moroni DeBruin is overruled; 7) Plaintiffs 9; objection to the depositions of the named Plaintiffs is sustained, in part, as follows: the depositions shall be limited to a time limit of four hours per named Plaintiff; and 8) Plaintiffs' objection to the depositions of the former Third-Party Plaintiffs is sustained. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/2018. (Rooney, M)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of discovery deadlines as follows: 1) The deadline for the filing of motions to compel and objections to proposed deponents is extended to January 16, 2018; 2) The deadline for the filing of responses to motions to compel and objections to proposed deponents to is extended to January 22, 2018; and 3) The hearing on motions to compel and objections to proposed deponents (currently set for January 18, 2018) is continued to J anuary 26, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court grants telephonic appearances, with each party wishing to so appear directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2018. (Rooney, M)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Document and File Redacted Version, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER on California Dairies, Inc.'s Request for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's Ruling (Doc. No. 482 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/30/2017. It is hereby ordered that CDI's Request for Reconsideration is DENIED, and instead CDI should refer to the Court's discussion above for clarification. (Valdez, E)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER DENYING DairyAmerica's motion to compel, document 468 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/2017. (Rooney, M)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER DENYING defendant DairyAmerica, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Retainer Agreements, documents 438 469 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/22/2017. (Rooney, M)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Granting DairyAmerica, Inc.'s Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/13/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Order DENYING Dairyamerica, Inc.'s 470 Motion to Compel PlaintiffsCommunications with Witnesses and their Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/6/2017. (Rosales, O)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding defendant California Dairies, Inc. producing documents and responding to plaintiffs' written discovery. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/24/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting in part plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, document [443-4]. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/23/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting in part, and denying in part, defendant California Dairies, Inc.'s Motion to Compel plaintiffs to respond to contention interrogatories in CDI's first set of interrogatories, documents 437 441 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/22/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Amended Request to Seal Exhibits to the Joint Statement Regarding Parties' Discovery Disputes and File Redacted Versions 465 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/15/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER DENYING DairyAmerica, Inc.'s request to seal documents, document 444 . Within 5 days of this order, DairyAmerica shall file either: 1) unredacted copies of its briefs and oppositions referenced in the request to seal; or 2) an amended request to seal with particularized showing consistent with the legal standards and public record already developed regarding these issues. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/9/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER Granting DairyAmerica, Inc's Request to Seal the Supplemental Memorandum to Exhibit H to the Joint Statement Regarding Parties' Discovery Disputes and File Redacted Version, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER ON DAIRYAMERICA INC.'S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS AND FILE REDACTED VERSIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STIPULATION and ORDER as follows: For the reasons provided in the parties' stipulation, the June 30, 2017 deadline to take the depositions of Ms. Ellingsworth, Ms. Bimemiller, and three depositions of current or former California Dairies employe es is vacated. Within fourteen days of either an answer to the Fourth Amended Complaint or an order denying leave to file a Fourth Amended Complaint, the parties shall submit a proposed schedule for taking the depositions with a status report. The remainder of the December 5, 2016 order (ECF No. 371 ) remains in effect. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/17/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER ON DAIRYAMERICA, INC.'S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS AND FILE REDACTED VERSIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO STRIKE (Motion Hearings currently set for 4/24/2017 are moved to 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DAIRYAMERICA, INC.'S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS AND FILE REDACTED VERSIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER ON NON-PARTY AND AMICI CURIAE LAND O'LAKES, INC. AND DAIRY FARMERS OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 STIPULATION and ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTHAMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, and ORDER VACATING MARCH 13, 2017 HEARING DATE - Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the Motion for Modification of Minute Entry, document 362 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/2016. (Rooney, M)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order DENYING Plaintiffs 363 Motion for Reimbursement of Costs Related to the October 3rd Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/23/2016. (Rosales, O)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/9/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER GRANTING, in part, Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion, documents 295 , 300 , and 330 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/15/2016. (Rooney, M)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/7/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER ON MOTION OF DAIRY AMERICA AND CALIFORNIA DAIRIES FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S ORDER OF MAY 2, 2016, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2016. (Kusamura, W)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 301 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/13/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)6, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/29/2016. (Kusamura, W)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Version or Briefing without Prejudice, document 276 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/21/2016. (Rooney, M)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS AND FILE REDACTED VERSIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/12/2016. (Kusamura, W)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING 259 Defendant DairyAmerica's Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/25/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding deadlines, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal documents and File Redacted Version, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/24/2016. (Kusamura, W)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Renewed 220 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 233 Request to Seal Document and File Redacted Version, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/13/2015. (Plaintiffs are permitted to file a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Consolidated Complaint on the public docket and Plaintiffs will email the unredacted version of the document to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov for filing under seal. Only the parties' counsel of record and the Court and its staff shall have access to the unredacted document.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Staying Discovery and Class Certification Discovery Deadline, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/12/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order GRANTING Plaintiffs' unopposed request to file single reply brief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/4/2015. (Rosales, O)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 FOURTH STIPULATION and ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint, document 220 , currently set for 10/26/2015 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 11/16/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Ju dge Anthony W. Ishii. Briefing scheduling deadlines re same are extended as follows: defendants' opposition to the motion to amend due by 10/23/2015; any reply briefs due by 11/6/2015. The Court further CONTINUES the Motion for Class Certificat ion currently set for hearing on 5/27/2016 to 7/8/2016 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Briefing scheduling deadlines re same are extended as follows: close of class certification discovery due by 12/14/201 5; last day for plaintiffs to file motion for class certification is 2/9/2016; last day for defendants to file opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification is 4/22/2016; and last day for plaintiffs to file reply brief to same is 5/20/2016. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/21/2015. (Rooney, M)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 221 Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/28/2015. (The Clerk of the Court is directed to file redacted versions of the following documents on the publi c docket and is further directed to file the unredacted versions of the documents under seal. Only the parties counsel of record and the Court and its staff shall have access to the unredacted document. 1. Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Consolidated Complaint; and 2. Plaintiffs [Proposed] Second Amended Consolidated Complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION and ORDER for Amending Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/2015. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 5/27/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/26/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Following Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Should be Denied, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/16/2015. (Plaintiffs renewed 155 motion to further amend the complaint is hereby DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting Defendant Dairy America's 204 Request for Judicial Notice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Granting Defendant DairyAmerica's 201 Motion For Leave to Exceed Page Limits, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/19/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 197 Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/9/2014.(Gaumnitz, R)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Plaintiffs' 160 Motion to File a Second Amended Complaint Should Not be Denied, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2014. (It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE why their motion to furth er amend the complaint to add claims and defendants should not be denied on the ground of futility of amendment in light of the foregoing discussion. Any response by Plaintiffs to this order to show cause shall be filed and served not later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of service of this order. Defendant may reply to Plaintiffs response to this order not later than fourteen (14) days from the date of service of Plaintiffs' response.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Stipulation to amend the scheduling order; Order Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2014. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/1/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin) (Figueroa, O)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Class Action ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 179 Request to Seal Reply Briefs and Other Documents, and to File Redacted Versions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/19/14. (Gonzalez, R)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING California Dairies Inc.'s Request to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Consolidated Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/30/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING Defendant DairyAmerica's Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions (Doc. 164 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/24/2014. (Arellano, S.)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents and File Redacted Versions In Part signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/3/2014. (Martinez, A)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION and ADDENDUM to Protective Order Regarding the Production of Protected Materials signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/9/2014. (Martinez, A)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER to Extend Time for DairyAmerica to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/1/2013. (Martinez, A)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complant re 121 , 49 and 46 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/11/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION and ORDER for Production of Electronically Stored Information signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/3/2013. (Martinez, A)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File a Joint Protocol Governing the Treatment of Electronically-Stored Information signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/17/2013. The parties shall file the ESI Protocol no later than May 31, 2013.(Martinez, A)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER vacating hearing date of May 13, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/13. (Nazaroff, H)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/30/2013. The 126 Motion for Protective Order is adopted.(Martinez, A)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Merits Discovery re 122 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/3/2013. (Martinez, A)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION and ORDER for Substitution of Party signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/19/2013. Plaintiff Diana Wolfe added; Bryan Wolfe (individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated) terminated. (Martinez, A)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Notice and ORDER to Withdrawal of Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/14/13. Attorney David A. Edelstein, PHV terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER TO STAY Proceedings and Statistically Close the Case, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/2010. Case STAYED. CASE STATISTICALLY CLOSED. (Sondheim, M)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 46 49 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/8/2010. Amended Complaint or Motion for Interlocutory Appeal due not later than thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order. (Esteves, C)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING August 31, 2009 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/26/2009. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION of Counsel Changing the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to August 31, 2009 and Extending Time to File Oppositions and Replies, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/06/2009. (Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Oppositions due by: 07/16/2009 and Replies due by: 08/13/2009) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlin et al v. DairyAmerica, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Carlin
Represented By: Christopher Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rahm
Represented By: Christopher Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rozwadowski
Represented By: Christopher Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Wolfe
Represented By: Christopher Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DairyAmerica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Dairies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?