[DLB] Rivera vs. City of Bishop, et al.
Plaintiff: Philip Troy Rivera
Defendant: City of Bishop, Gutierrez, Novello, Giuseppe and DOE 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2009cv00606
Filed: April 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Inyo
Presiding Judge: Theresa A. Goldner
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/18/11. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/21/2010. (Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on 2/28/2011, Defendants Reply shall be due 3/21/2011, and Motion for Summary Judgment previously set for 1/31/2011 is CONTINUED to 4/4/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Enlarging dates for Response and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/15/2010. (Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/30/2010; Defendants Reply due by 1/20/2011)(Figueroa, O)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Continuing Trial and Other Dates, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/16/2010. (Motion For Summary Judgment previously set for 12/13/2010 has been CONTINUED to 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Pre trial Conference previously set for 1/3/2011 has been CONTINUED to 4/18/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, and Jury Trial previously set for 2/8/2011 has been CONTINUED to 6/1/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/6/2010. The Settlement Conference is RESET from 10/13/2010 to 11/10/2010 at 10:30 AM in Bakersfield at 1200 Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties are reminded that Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due (one week prior to the new date) 11/3/2010.(Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2010. The Settlement Conference now set for 9/27/2010 is CONTINUED to 10/13/2010 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Arellano, S.)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference from 8/5/2010 to 9/27/2010 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston - signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/20/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing Settlement Conference from 6/8/2010 to 8/5/2010 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston - signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/15/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING Rule 16 Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/10/2009. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/25/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: [DLB] Rivera vs. City of Bishop, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Troy Rivera
Represented By: G. Randall Garrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?