Simmons v. Akanno et al
Case Number: 1:2009cv00659
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice, Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/22/11. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REVOKING In Forma Pauperis Status; Plaintiff is Ordered to Pay Remaining Balance of Filing Fee within thirty (30)days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 06/06/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Request for Leave to Appeal Screening Orders 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 4/22/11. (Gonzalez, R)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING 23 Complaint, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, for Failure to Comply with an Order of the Court; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 2/18/2011. Third Amended Complaint due by 3/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, For Failure To State A Claim (Doc. 10 ), ORDER Denying Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 12 ), Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/7/2010. ( Amended Complaint due by 1/11/2011) (Fahrney, E) (Attachment: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Akanno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?