Charles Poolis, et al. v. Countrywide, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Charles Poolis and Carmen Poolis
Defendant: Countrywide, N.A., Remax Properties West, Bank Of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00669
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING Action with Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/22/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER regarding 17 Motion to Dismiss and 25 Motion to postpone action signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2010. Amended Complaint due by 11/15/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER vacating hearing date of 8/9/2010 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RESETTING Hearing for August 9, 2010 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2010. Defendant Bank of Americas motion to dismiss is rescheduled for hearing on 8/9/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Plaintiff's written opposition to the motion or a statement of non opposition due by 7/26/2010. (Bradley, A)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER vacating hearing date of 11/16/2009 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/12/09. (Nazaroff, H)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/10/2009. Show Cause Response due by 12/4/2009. (Sondheim, M)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 9/30/2009 to 11/10/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/30/2009. (Hernandez, M)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re: Stipulation 11 to File First Amended Complaint signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/9/2009. ( Amended Complaint due by 9/23/2009)(Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Poolis, et al. v. Countrywide, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Poolis
Represented By: Timothy D. Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Poolis
Represented By: Timothy D. Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remax Properties West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?