[SMS] Rojas et al v. Marko Zaninovich, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Santiago Rojas and Josefino Ramirez
Defendant: Marko Zaninovich, Inc. and Sunview Vineyards of California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00705
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1801 Farmworker Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting 282 Final Approval of Class Settlement; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part 284 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/11/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 275 Stipulation, as Amended Orally, to Provide Amended Benefit Forms to Certain Class Members, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/11/2015. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING 275 Stipulation, as Amended Orally, to Provide Amended Benefit Forms to Certain Class Members, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2015. (Hall, S)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER DISCHARGING 270 the Order to Show Cause Dated March 10, 2015; ORDER GRANTING Final Approval of the Class Notice Packet, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/2015. (Hall, S)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2015. Show Cause Response due within 5 days. (Hall, S)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 256 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/4/2015. (Hall, S)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING 256 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2015. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 6/11/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2014. Further Status Conference set for 10/15/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER GRANTING 239 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2014. (Hall, S)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/10/2014. Status Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Status Conference set for 9/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER re: Reconsideration of Class Notice Approval, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/2013. (Marrujo, C)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER construing Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's order as a request for reconsideration pursuant to Local Rule 303. Order denying Defendant's Request for Stay. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/3/13. (Nazaroff, H)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING Final Approval of the Class Action 223 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2013. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER DENYING Final Approval of Class Notice; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO AMEND the Class Notice and Comply with the Court's Order Dated June 17, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2013. (Hall, S)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Regarding the Proposed Class Notice 218 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/17/2013. (Hall, S)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DIRECTING the Parties to Meet and Confer, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/29/2013. (Hall, S)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER RE: Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/28/2013. (Flores, E)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER VACATING hearing date of June 4, 2012 and taking matter under submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2012. (Figueroa, O)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Adopting in Part the 192 Findings and Recommendations Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 36 37 Motion For Class Certification, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/11/2012. (Within fourteen (14) days of the District Courts order, Plaintiffs SHALL file a proposed notice for the Courts approval.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2012. Objections to F&R due by 2/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Class Certification signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/3/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 1300 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT of Videotaped Deposition of Aaron Woolfson dated 5/3/2011. (Filed as part of the record per 182 Order by Judge Ishii.),(Gaumnitz, R)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION and ORDER staying all pre-trial deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/29/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion for Class Certification signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting 105 Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION and ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2011. Jointly disclose merits-related experts by 12/2/2011. Jointly disclose rebuttal, merits-related experts by 12/23/2011. Merits-related expe rt discovery by 2/10/2012. Dispositive Motion filing deadline 1/27/2012, hearing by 3/12/2012. Non-Dispositive Motion filing deadline 2/24/2012, hearing by 3/26/2012. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. No other dates are modified; no other amendments to the case schedule will be permitted except upon a showing of exceptional good cause. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Defendant Marko Zaninovich, Inc. Without Prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/8/11. (Hellings, J)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 82 Defendant's Motion to Compelsigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/5/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Marko Zaninovich, Inc., signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/15/11. Marko Zaninovich, Inc. terminated. (Verduzco, M)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2011. Defendants to disclose any rebuttal experts by 6/1/2011, deposition by 6/10/2011, and conclude 6/10/2011. Parties to disclose all mreits-related experts by 9/2/2011, rebuttal by 10/3/2011. Serve briefs related to class certification motion via email by 6:00 p.m. on due date. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2011. Rule 26 to defendants 4/18/2011. Expert Discovery concludes 5/6/2011. Motion for Class Cert filed by 5/16/2011, opposition due 6/13/2 011, reply 6/2/2011. Dispositive Motions filing deadline 9/23/2011, hearing deadline 11/7/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/14/11. The New Case Number is 1:09-cv-00705-AWI-JLT.(Verduzco, M)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulation of Confidentiality and PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/24/2011. (Herman, H)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the Extension of Time for Defendants Marko Zaninovich, Inc. and Sunview Vineyards of California, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/27/2009. Responsive Pleading due by 11/2/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for defendants Marko Zaninovich Inc., and Sunview Vineyards of California Inc., to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Defendants may have until 10/26/2009 to file their responsive pleading. Order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/15/2009. (Timken, A)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/18/2009. Lead Case is 1:09-cv-00705-AWI-SMS, Member Case is 1:06-cv-00288-AWI-SMS. MEMBER CASE CLOSED. All future filings to be made in Lead Case. Plaintiffs are directed to file an amended complaint combining the two cases within thirty (30) days. Amended Complaint due by 9/21/2009. (Jessen, A).
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Appointing Interim Class Counsel signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/16/2009. The Mallison and McNichols Groups must file materials they wish the court to consider by 4PM, Wednesday, 8/5/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: [SMS] Rojas et al v. Marko Zaninovich, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Rojas
Represented By: Sabrina Seungyoun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefino Ramirez
Represented By: Sabrina Seungyoun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marko Zaninovich, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunview Vineyards of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?