July 21, 2015 |
Filing
202
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement 184 ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 185 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/21/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
April 10, 2015 |
Filing
183
ORDER on 182 Stipulation to Continue Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/10/2015. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing CONTINUED to 7/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
181
ORDER APPROVING 180 THE AMENDED CLASS NOTICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2015. (Hall, S)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
179
ORDER CONTINUING the Deadlines Related to the Class Notice Based Upon 178 the Stipulation of the Parties; ORDER CONTINUING the Final Approval and Fitness Hearing to June 18, 2015 at 09:00 AM at 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File an Amended Class Notice Packet, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2015. (Hall, S)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
177
ORDER GRANTING 176 Plaintiffs' Request for Approval of the Amended Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2014. (Hall, S)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing
175
ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Approval of the Revised Class Notice; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File an Amended Class Notice No Later Than December 5, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/2014. (Hall, S)
|
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
173
ORDER GRANTING 164 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 3/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
163
ORDER extending time to file motion for preliminary approval of class settlement. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/4/14. (Nazaroff, H)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
162
ORDER GRANTING 161 an Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File a Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2014. Motion filing deadline 8/22/2014. (Hall, S)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing
160
ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT 159 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2014. Motion for preliminary approval of class settlement SHALL be filed no later than 8/1/2014. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED and any pendings motions are TERMINATED. (Hall, S)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
158
ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DENYING Defendant's Motion for Decertification of the Class 145 , 157 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/14. (Hellings, J)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
157
ORDER DISREGARDING Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Denying Defendant's Motion for Decertification of the Class re 145 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/28/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
153
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Decertify Class 152 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/22/2013. Motion to Decertify Class CONTINUED to 1/23/2014 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
August 16, 2013 |
Filing
144
ORDER VACATING Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/15/2013. (In order to allow more time for the court to consider the cross motions for summary judgment, the Pretrial Conference of September 12, 2013, and Trial date of November 19, 2013, are VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
143
ORDER VACATING Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/18/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously set hearing date of July 22, 2013, at 1:30PM is VACATED, and no party shall appear at that time. As of that date, the court will take the 118 124 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment under submission and will thereafter issue its decision.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
April 19, 2013 |
Filing
117
ORDER amending the scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2013. (Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 4/29/2013; Non-Dispositive Motions heard by 5/28/2013; Dispositive Motions filed by 6/10/2013; Dispositive Motions he ard by 7/22/2013; Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 11/19/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
112
ORDER ADOPTING 106 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2013. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing
106
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/29/2012. Referred to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/12/2012. (Hall, S)
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER Re Motion For Reconsideration (Docs. 60, 66, 81, and 82), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/5/2012. ( 60 Motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The 1/31/2012 Order adopting the F&R and denying class cert ification remains. However, Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a second motion for class certification with respect to meal periods of Garza employees who worked at El Rancho facilities that is consistent with the findings of this order. Plaintiffs must file such a motion within twenty (20) days of the filing of this order. The motions for 66 interlocutory appeal and 81 82 summary judgment are DENIED without prejudice. The trial date of 9/11/2012 and all associated dates are VACATED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
93
ORDER vacating hearing date of May 21, 2012 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/16/12. (Nazaroff, H)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
80
ORDER Denying 64 Motion to Compel, and ORDER Vacating Hearing date of 4/9/2012 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/3/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
March 15, 2012 |
Filing
74
ORDER vacating hearing date of March 19, 2012 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/15/12. (Nazaroff, H)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
56
ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification (Doc. 33 & 52 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/30/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing
52
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 33 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/2011. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/23/2011. Opposition to motion for class certification due 10/21/2011, Reply to opposition to motion for class certification due 11/14/2011. Motion Hearing re: Class Certification RESET from 10/17/2011 to 12/7/2011 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
32
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/16/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Compel; Order Granting 26 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/13/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
24
STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2011. Class Certification 9/9/11, Class Discovery 6/3/11, Expert Discovery 7/11/11, Merits Discovery 2/3/12, Non-Dispositive Motion filing by 2/17 /2012, hearing by 3/19/2012, Dispositive Motion filing 4/6/12, hearing by 5/21/2012, Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.Jury Trial set for 9/11/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|