United States v. Approximately $19,500.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Approximately $19,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2009cv00791
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and FINAL JUDGMENT of FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/15/2009. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Document 20 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2009. (Scrivner, E)
November 12, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 18 Ex Parte Application For Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/11/2009. Matter referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) court days of service. (Esteves, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Approximately $19,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Deanna Lynne Martinez, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $19,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?