San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Locke et al
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Defendant: Gary F. Locke, United States Department of Commerce, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, James W. Balsiger, Rodney R. McInnis, United States Department of the Interior, United States Bureau of Reclamation, Michael L. Connor and Donald R. Glaser
Case Number: 1:2009cv01053
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 787 FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER extending stay regarding motion for attorneys' fees and other expenses signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/15/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to return Deposited Funds signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/30/2015. (Original signed Order forwarded to Sacramento Financial Department).(Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 781 PLAINTIFF STATE WATER CONTACTORS' AND FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING STAY REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 29, 2015. (Munoz, I)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Plaintiff State Water Contactors' And Federal Defendants' JOINT STIPULATION And ORDER Extending Stay Regarding Motion For Attorneys' Fees And Other Expenses, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/2015. (Fahrney, E)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 778 SECOND STIPULATION And ORDER Regarding Motion For Attorneys' Fees And Other Expenses, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/2015.(Case Management Deadline: 12/15/2015) (Fahrney, E)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 774 STIPULATED AMENDED Final Judgment (Including Schedule For Remand), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/5/2015. (Fahrney, E)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 771 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND OTHER EXPENSES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 19, 2015. (Munoz, I)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER RE NINTH CIRCUIT DECISION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 25, 2014. (Munoz, I)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND REMAND SCHEDULE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 4, 2014. (Doc. 745). (Munoz, I)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER PERMITTING RESPONSE RE REQUEST TO EXTEND REMAND SCHEDULE (Doc. 745) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on Febraury 19, 2014. (Munoz, I)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re 713 Motion to Extend Remand Schedule, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/9/2013. (On or before 2/15/2014, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND REMAND SCHEDULE (Doc. 703) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 30, 2013. (Munoz, I)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 688 STIPULATION and ORDER re Motion for Attorneys' Feed and/or Costs, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 660 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding CVP And SWP Operations In 2012, ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/2012. (Fahrney, E)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Final Judgment (Including Schedule for Remand), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/12/11. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 646 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/1/2011 regarding schedule for completion of remand. (Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER RE: Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/29/2011. (Kusamura, W)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MEMORANDUM DECISION Re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/20/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER deeming pending motions for injunctive relief 538 590 and related motion to strike [DOC. 559] WITHDRAWN, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/18/2011. (Any opposition papers shall be filed and served on or before 3/21/2011, and Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order shall be heard concurrently with the hearing related to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, currently scheduled 3/23/2011 through 3/25/2011.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 601 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Exhibits, Witnesses and Oral Argument for Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/16/2011. (Kusamura, W)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 585 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/28/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motions to Strike and Denying Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motion to Strike, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/19/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER Re Admission of Extra - Record Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Cummins signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/2/2010. (Esteves, C)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Approving Withdrawal of Thomas W. Birmingham as counsel for Plaintiff Westlands Water District signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2010. (Figueroa, O)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 470 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: Summary Judgment briefing page limits and modification of briefing schedule and order argument dates, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2010. (Kusamura, W)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER RE: Admission of Extra-Record Testimony of Ray Hilborn, Steven P. Cramer, and James Snow, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/13/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER declining to appoint 706 Expert at this time, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 08-10-10. (Coffman, Lisa)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Addition of Cramer Fish Sciences Document to Administrative Record signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/6/2010. (Esteves, C)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER Re Documents Submitted In Camera In Accordance with 6/21/10 Memorandum Decision 401 . Plaintiffs' motion to supplement the administrative record with documents withheld under the attorney-client privilege (1-9 and 60-63) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06/30/10. The CD on which the sealed documents were lodged has been securely destroyed. (Coffman, Lisa)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re San Luis Plaintiffs' Motions to Augment 134 and Supplement 139 , and Stanislaus River Plaintiffs' Motion to Augment 145 the administrative record, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06/21/10. (Coffman, Lisa)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER to Clerk of Court to Hold Bond signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/7/2010. The Clerk of Court is ordered to hold the $5,000 cash bond previously posted by the San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Association and Westlands Water District Plaintiffs and that cash bond shall be posted to secure the Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction dated May 27, 2010, pending further order of the Court.(Bradley, A)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW, supplementing 347 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06-01-2010. (Coffman, Lisa)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/27/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER denying 325 Motion to Strike, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/10/2010. (Kusamura, W)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Pursuant to Status Conference Held on March 16, 2010 re Case Schedule 283 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/5/2010. (Arellano, S.)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER on the Federal Defendant's Motion to Strike, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/20/2010. (Kusamura, W)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM DECISION RE Cross Motions for Summary Judgment Re NEPA Issues 82 83 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 03/05/2010. (Coffman, Lisa)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/12/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Re RPA Action IV.2.3, effective through 2/19/10, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/5/10.
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Following January 26, 2010 Sttus Conference, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/29/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Requiring Department Of Water Resources To File Complaint In Intervention On Or Before 1/30/2010, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/22/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 80), Denying as Moot Motions to Strike Portions of Motions to Dismiss (Doc. 92, 97), and Denying Motion to Strike Portions of Reply (Doc. 125), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/12/2010. (Coffman, Lisa)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER To Extend Time To File Responsive Pleading, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/23/2009. (IT IS SO ORDERED that in consideration of DWRs intent to file a complaint in intervention, DWRs time to file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint shall be extended so that DWRs responsive pleadings, if any, may be filed and served by no later than 2/5/2010.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Briefing Schedule signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/14/2009. (Verduzco, M)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER Re: Relief From Requirement of Local Rule 56-260 Re: Filing of Separate Statements signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/29/2009. (Jessen, A)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting Stipulation re: Administrative Record Briefing Schedule and re: Page Limits, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/16/09. (Verduzco, M)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/02/2009. (Martin, S)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Federal Defendants' Motion to Consolidate to be heard on 8/31/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/28/2009. (Rooney, M)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2009.(Answer Deadline: 9/4/2009) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Locke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Hanspeter Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Hanspeter Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Balsiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney R. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?