Porter v. Jennings
Plaintiff: Samuel Kenneth Porter
Defendant: Jennings
Case Number: 1:2009cv01244
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 41 (Doc. 30 ), ORDER Dismissing Action In Its Entirety Without Prejudice, ORDER Directing Clerk To Close File, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/26/2010. It is ORDERED that: Plaintiff' ;s motion to dismiss the complaint is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the file in this case and adjust the docket to reflect voluntary dismissal of this action pursuant to Rule 41(a).CASE CLOSED. (Scrivner, E)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 23 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/4/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Motion For Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Docs. 7 , 10 , and 16 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2009. (Scrivner, E)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 6 Motion for a Polygraph, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2009. (Sondheim, M)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING Incomplete Amended Complaint and Requiring Plaintiff to Comply with Court's Order filed August 4, 2009 within thirty days,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/26/2009. (Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2009) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Kenneth Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?