Fields v. Tilton et al
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Fields
Defendant: James Tilton and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01406
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Request for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41; ORDER Dismissing Action in its Entirety Without Prejudice signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06/06/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/19/2011 recommending that action proceed on 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 5/23/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:09-cv-2140 DAD) to Fresno (1:09-cv-1406 GSA) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/11/09.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?