Randall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian L Randall
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2009cv01439
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs appeal from the administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security; Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, and against Plaintiff Brian L. Randall, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/17/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request for leave to file late brief, 19 , Nunc Pro Tunc, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/8/2010. (Timken, A)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/17/2009. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L Randall
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?