Coalition for a Sustainable Delta v. United States Department of Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta
Defendant: United States Department of Interior and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 1:2009cv01471
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/12/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER For Compromise Settlement, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/21/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Parties Stipulation and ORDER for Further 28-Day Continuance of Status Conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/5/2010. ( Status Conference set for 4/15/2010 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Figueroa, O)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER For Further 28-Day Continuance of Status Conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/5/2010. Initial Scheduling/Status Conference CONTINUED from 2/18/2010 to 3/18/2010 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Esteves, C)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/20/2010 to 2/18/2010 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/15/2010. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta v. United States Department of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?