Rodrigo Flores v. Merced Irrigation District et al
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Flores
Defendant: Merced Irrigation District, Dan Pope and Robert Blum
Case Number: 1:2009cv01529
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER After Settlement; ORDER all pending dates and matters VACATED, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/17/2011. (Case Management Deadline: 4/18/2011) (Martin, S)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADD WITNESS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 25, 2011. (Lira, I)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/2011. (Arellano, S.)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Disputed Evidentiary Issues for Trial signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/1/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JOINT STIPULATION to Re-Open Non-Expert Discovery for Deposition of Connie Peraiano; ORDER Theron Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/13/2011. (Arellano, S.)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER TO UPDATE SETTLEMENT STATUS AND TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 13, 2011. (Lira, I)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Regarding Attorneys' Fees Related to Motions to Amend Scheduling Order and to Withdraw Admissions. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/10/2010. (Hernandez, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 9, 2010. (Lira, I)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order for the limited purpose of seeking relief from the deemed admissions and, FURTHER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion Seeking to Withdraw Responses to Request for Admissions, documents 59 and 60 . Plaintiff's counsel is directed to pay defendants' fees and costs incurred re same and also for preparing the portion of the summary judgment motion related to the deemed admissions; case management deadline set for12/3/201 0 for receipt of declaration of defense counsel outlining the hours, fees, and costs pertinent to the previously outlined; plaintiff has seven days from receipt of said declaration to file objections; order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/23/2010. (Rooney, M)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 46 : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2010. (Hernandez, M)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON BRIEFING PAGE LIMITS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 1, 2010. (Lira, I)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER that there shall be no exclusion of plaintiff's experts or expert testimony based on plaintiff's failure to disclose expert reports on 7/20/2010. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/17/2010. (Hernandez, M)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Defendants Supplemental/Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline, Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/12/2010. (Arellano, S.)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting extension of non-expert discovery deadline to 7/30/2010. All other deadlines shall remain as previously ordered by the Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/13/2010. (Hernandez, M)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/18/2010. (Hernandez, M)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/23/2009. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures- 12/22/2009, Non Expert- 4/30/2010, Expert- 7/19/2010. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline: 7/19/2010. Dispositive Motion Dead line: 9/15/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial (12 Days) set for 3/7/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigo Flores v. Merced Irrigation District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Flores
Represented By: Lawrence D Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?