Ochoa v. Jean-Pierre
Plaintiff: Raymond Ochoa
Defendant: Jean-Pierre
Case Number: 1:2009cv01627
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/3/14. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/12/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Douglas Gordon is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/12. Discovery due by 3/29/2013, Dispositive Motions filed by 5/31/2013. (Gonzalez, R)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/25/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Douglas Gordon is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/2/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Douglas Gordon is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on 27 Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/08/2012. Discovery Cut-Off Continued to 11/6/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/7/2013. (Flores, E)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appoint Counsel 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/27/11: Attorney Douglas L. Gordon APPOINTED to represent Raymond Ochoa. (Hellings, J)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Referring Case to Pro Bono Program for the Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2010. (Verduzco, M)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/10/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. Jean-Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?