Goolsby v. Carrasco et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Goolsby
Defendant: M. Carrasco, Gonzales, L L Schulteis, M. Gifford, K. Holland, R. Mayo, C. Rousta and N. Grannis
Case Number: 1:2009cv01650
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DISCHARGING 129 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/8/2012. The Matter Remains CLOSED and No Further Filings Will be Accepted in This Case. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER to Defendants to SHOW CAUSE Why the 128 Stipulation to Dismiss Should Not Be Stricken and/or Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/12. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting Stipulation To Dismiss The Action (Doc. 125 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER WITHDRAWING WRITS OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM DIRECTING the production of Plaintiff: Thomas Goolsby and Inmates Allen, Baumgaertel, Earle and Hunt for Trial on November 21, 2011 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/08/2011. (Martin-Gill, S) (Certified Copy of this order served via USPS on California Correctional Institution and Kern Valley State Prisons Litigation Coordinators and Out to Court)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDERED that no later than December 23, 2011, a request dismissing the case, shall be filed; ORDERED that all pending dates, including the trial date are VACATED, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/07/2011. (Case Management Deadline: 12/23/2011)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE: COURTROOM/TRIAL DECORUM signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2011. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Addressing Inmate Witness James Allen's Letter Regarding His Attendance At Trial And Directing Plaintiff To File A Response (Doc. 109 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2011. (Fahrney, E)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Thomas Goolsby, CDC #F-19778 Plaintiff, for Trial on November 21, 2011 at 9:00am, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/11. (Verduzco, M)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Setting Confidential Teleconference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/11. Teleconference set for 10/27/2011 at 9:00 AM. (Verduzco, M)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness Kevin Allen Hunt for Trial November 21, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/13/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Appointment of Advisement Counsel; MOTION For Court Order to Produce Unredacted Copies; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Order Compliance With Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/2011. (Marrujo, C)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SECOND ORDER to Defendant to Lodge Document signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/27/2011. (Flores, E)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER to Defendant to Lodge Document, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/23/11. (Gonzalez, R)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM To Transport Witness Ryan Kenneth Earle, CDC #V-75405, for Trial on November 21, 2011 at 9:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/11. (Gonzalez, R)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/14/11. (Gonzalez, R)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Thomas Goolsby for Settlement Conference Hearing on November 3, 2011 at 9:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/11. (Gonzalez, R)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER regarding 58 Motion for the Attendance of Unincarceratd Witnesses: Defendant Gonzales and Dr. Ponder,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/1/2011. (21 - Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 56 Motion to Amend Interrogatory Number Nine and Renew Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/19/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 50 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and Request for a Trial Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/11. (Verduzco, M)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/3/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Extend Time For Filing Motions to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/15/2010. (Motions filed by 1/16/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 41 Request for a Court Ruling signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2010. (Flores, E)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Screening and Stay of Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/30/2010. (Jessen, A)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/24/2010. (Marrujo, C)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Docs. 3 , 15 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/15/2010. (Scrivner, E)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Motion For Communication With Prisoners (Doc. 27 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/1/2010. (Scrivner, E)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Within Twenty Days 3 , 15 ; ORDER GRANTING Rule 56(F) Motion 23 ; OPPOSITION DUE BY JULY 20, 2010, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/4/10. (Hellings, J)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2010. Service is appropriate for Gonzales. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the 1 Complaint filed on 9/17/2009. Case Management Deadline: 2/8/2010. (Sondheim, M)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Either File Amended Complaint or Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed Only Against Defendant Gonzales Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/2/2009. Notice or Amended Complaint due by 1/5/2010. (Sondheim, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goolsby v. Carrasco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L L Schulteis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rousta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?