Medina-Herrera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Fernando Medina-Herrera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2009cv01769
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER regarding 25 Motion for Attorney's Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/6/2012. (Figueroa, O)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER for the Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/22/2010. (Arellano, S.)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/29/2010 REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security and Request for Entry of Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for plaintiff to file his opening brief. Deadline to file opening brief 10/20/2010. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/9/2010. (Hernandez, M)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 15 Defendant's Motion to Remand. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/2010. (Hernandez, M)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/07/2009. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina-Herrera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Medina-Herrera
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?