Delgado v. Orchard Supply Hardware Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Delgado
Defendant: Orchard Supply Hardware Corporation and Save Mart Supermarkets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01839
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION for DISMISSAL of Action and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/23/11. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER After Settlement: that parties submit no later than 12/6/2011, a stipulation and order for dismissal. All dates are vacated including the November 22, 2011 motions in limine hearing and the December 12, 2011 trial. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2011. (Herman, H)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint STIPULATION to Set Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines; and ORDER: Exhibit exchange - 11/4/2011; Exhibit Conference - 11/11/2011; Serve proposed jury instructions and verdict forms - 11/18/2011; Conduct conference re: jury instructions - 11/30/20 11; file and serve trial brief - 12/2/2011; File all agreed-on jury instructions and special verdict form with disputed additions clearly marked - 12/5/2011; File and serve list of pre-marked exhibits - 12/7/2011; Submit pre-marked exhibits to the Cl erk's office - 12/7/2011; File joint neutral statement of the case - 12/7/2011; File proposed joint jury voir dire - 12/7/2011. JURY TRIAL set for 12/12/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McA uliffe. Motions-in-Limine: file and served by 11/1/2011; file and serve oppositions by 11/10/2011; and MOTIONS-in-LIMINE HEARING set for 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/2011. (Herman, H)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Amend 71 : (1) Grants OSH's motion to amend its answer, and (2) Allows Delgado to depose OSH's newly designated witness by 10/21/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/2011. (Herman, H)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION re Pretrial Dates: ORDER - (1) Motions in Limine filed by 10/19/2011; (2) Motions in Limine Response filed by 10/28/2011; with a hearing for Motions in Limine on November 9, 2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge McAuliffe. signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/29/2011. (Herman, H)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 4, 2011. (Lira, I)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ORCHARD SUPPLY HARDWARE CORPORATIONS' REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 3, 2011. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Lira, I)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON REQUEST TO FILE OPPOSITION UNDER SEAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 27, 2011. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Lira, I)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING defendant's, Orchard Supply Hardware, request to file certain documents in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment, document 35 , under seal; a redacted version said documents to filed within two (2) days of service of this order; order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/28/2011. (Rooney, M)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER extending dates set in scheduling order. 1) The non-expert discovery cut-off date is April 15, 2011; 2) The expert discovery cut-off date is May 13, 2011; 3) The deadline for filing non-dispositive motions is May 25, 2011; 4) T he hearing date on non-dispositive motions is on or before June 22, 2011; 5) The deadline for filing dispositive motions is June 28, 2011; 6) The hearing date on dispositive motions is on or before August 9, 2011; 7) The pre-trial conference is set f or September 20, 2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; 8) The trial is set for October 31, 2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; and 9) Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed within five (5) days of the date of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2011. (Timken, A)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION for DISMISSAL of Action Against Defendant Save Mart Supermarkets Only and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/22/2010. (Bradley, A)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION re Filing of an Amended Complaint and re Continuance of the Scheduling Conference; ORDER: Amended Complaint [Docs. 15] was filed on 3/3/2010. Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 3/9/2010 to May 17, 2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/8/2010. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Orchard Supply Hardware Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Delgado
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Supply Hardware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?