Mejia v. Harrington
Petitioner: Joshua Michael Mejia
Respondent: Harrington
Case Number: 1:2009cv01885
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 11 , Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment in Favor of Respondent, and Declining to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/8/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/20/10. (Hellings, J)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 3 Motion for evidentiary hearing as premature and denying 4 Motion to Stay as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/21/10. (Lundstrom, T)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/3/2009. (Jessen, A)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/3/2009. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Michael Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?