O'Dell v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Dell
Defendant: Terry Lee, Inyo County Sheriff's Department Child Support Services and Linda Awisman
Case Number: 1:2009cv01921
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Inyo
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/27/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Verduzco, M)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Regarding Dismissal Of Action 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/28/2010. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. F&R's referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 9/2/2010. (Scrivner, E)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/7/2010. (Status Report Deadline: 5/12/2010) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Dell v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inyo County Sheriff's Department Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Awisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?