Vigas v. Harrington
Petitioner: Miguel A. Zavala Vigas
Respondent: K. Harrington
Case Number: 1:2009cv01992
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 32 Petitioner's Motion for Relief From Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/27/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 30 Motion for Application to File Belated Certificate of Appealability, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/13/2011. (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 18 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and the 1 Habeas Corpus Petition be DISMISSED with Prejudice for Petitioner's Failure to Comply with 28 USC 2244 (d)'s One Year Limitation,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/07/2010. Objections to F&R due by 5/11/2010 (Martin, S)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigas v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel A. Zavala Vigas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?