Coalition for a Sustainable Delta et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta and Kern County Water Agency
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency and William Craig Fugate
Case Number: 1:2009cv02024
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Adopting Settlement Agreement and Dismissing With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/12. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/2012. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 3/1/2012 has been CONTINUED to 4/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. No further continuances of the Initial Scheduling Conference will be granted.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION and ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 1/26/12 to Thursday, March 1, 2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/5/2012. (Herman, H)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET for Thursday, January 26, 2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/22/2011. (Herman, H)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/19/2011. (Coffman, Lisa)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER for leave to exceed page limit, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/4/2011. (Kusamura, W)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER for leave to exceed page limits signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/18/2010. (Figueroa, O)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM, DECISION RE: Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 102 : signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/10/2010. (Filing Deadline: 6/11/2010.) (Kusamura, W)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File reply, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/4/2010. (Kusamura, W)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER STAYING Discovery pending the ruling of the Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/15/2010. (Kusamura, W)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 79 Motion to Sever, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/17/09. (Coffman, Lisa)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Re 706 Expert(s), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/8/2009.(Filing Deadline: 10/14/2009) (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kern County Water Agency
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Craig Fugate
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?