Crim v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Crim
Defendant: Management & Training Corp., Neil Hamilton Adler, T. Stewart, Cynthia Mann, Nickie McDonough, Dale Patrick, C. Logan, McBride and Kwonto Sy
Case Number: 1:2009cv02041
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 109 Plaintiff's Second Request to Use Electronic Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING 104 Request to Use Electronic Filing, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, RECOMMENDING THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER 97 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/12/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER for Plaintiff to Either: (1) Respond in Writing that he intends to Litigate this case, or (2) File a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of this Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/08/2017.(Case Management Deadline: 10-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION, Recommending That This Action be Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/28/13, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed Only With Plaintiff's Claim for Retaliation Against Defendant McBride and that All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed From this Action re 73 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/13/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER IN RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Request to Correct the Record 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/13/13: The record in this case does not require correction. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/2012. (Jessen, A)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER for Clerk to: (1) File Amended Complaint Lodged on June 19, 2012, as the Third Amended Complaint for This Action (Doc. 68 ) and (2) Open a New Civil Rights Action With Complaint Lodged on June 18, 2012 (Doc. 67 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/2/2012. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for Plaintiff to Notify Court of His Intentions in Submitting Two Complaints, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/2012. 30-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER VACATING 61 Order for Plaintiff to Submit Service Documents; ORDER VACATING 62 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of June 5, 2012; and ORDER for Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint in Compliance With Court's Screening Order (Doc. 59 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/14/2012. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 35 Action Proceed only against Defendants Mann and Patrick for Violations of Due Process, and all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed; Objections, if any, Due in 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/2012. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 7/9/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 55 Change of Address to Attorney's Office; ORDER DENYING Substitution of Attorneys; ORDER for Plaintiff to File Notice of Change of Address Within Thirty (30) Days; and ORDER Directing Clerk to Mail Change of Address Form and Copy of This Order to Plaintiff at Two Addresses, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/18/2012. (Jessen, A)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Adopting 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 44 , 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/27/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/02/2012. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/7/2012. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/3/2011 denying 37 Motion to compel production of disclosure statement as moot.(Lundstrom, T)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCREENING ORDER ( 23 Resolved); ORDER DISMISSING 28 First Amended Complaint Under Local Rule 220, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDER For Clerk to Send Plaintiff a 1983 Complaint Form; Thirty Day Deadline to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/26/2011. (Amended Complaint due by 2/28/2011.) (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form) (Marrujo, C)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Addressing Motion to Clarify Order 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/25/2011. (Marrujo, C)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/5/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 12 15 19 21 Motions for Entry of Default as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/08/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crim v. Management & Training Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corp.
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hamilton Adler
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Stewart
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Mann
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickie McDonough
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Patrick
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Logan
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McBride
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwonto Sy
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?