Ageel v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Omar Ageel
Defendant: F. Gonzales, G. Ybarra, J. Razo, L. Knight, A. Solis, A. Morales and D. Calvillo
Case Number: 1:2009cv02076
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/27/2012, DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 38 Notice. (Marrujo, C)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request For Appointment of Counsel AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss re 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Dismissing the Matter as to Defendants Thornberry and Knight signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/24/2012. (Flores, E)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Plaintiff to File Opposition OR Non-Opposition to 26 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/2/2012. (Filing Deadline: 2/27/2012.) (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER 31 Clarifying Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/27/2012. (Flores, E)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for a Proof of Service Sheet 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/18/11. (Hellings, J)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of time and denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/20/2011. Filing Deadline set for 5/23/2011 to submit service documents.(Lundstrom, T)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/9/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ageel v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Ageel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Razo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Calvillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?