King v. Emerald Energy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: John King
Defendant: Emerald Energy, LLC and Ray Allen
Case Number: 1:2009cv02128
Filed: December 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE Contested Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/4/13: Contested Hearing CONTINUED to February 12, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder.(Hellings, J)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER on Application for Appearance and Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/3/13: Examination Hearing set for 8/14/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Hellings, J)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Application for an Order to Appear for Examination by Ray Allen, document 68 . PLEASE NOTE: The Examination Hearing previously noticed for 6/27/2013 at 8:00 am before Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill has been re-noticed for 7/2/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/5/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Continuing Debtor Exam, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/29/11. The Court continues the examination to November 15, 2011 at 8:30 a.m.(Verduzco, M)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE CONTEMPT HEARING - GRANTED. Contempt hearing currently set for 8/12/201 has been CONTINUED to 9/12/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 27, 2011. (Lira, I)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER to Appear for Examination re: Enforcement of Judgment 42 : Judgment Debtor Exam set for 3/18/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/6/2011. (Herman, H)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT dated *10/04/2010* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant pursuant to order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/2010. (Martin, S)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations Recommending Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Emerald Energy 29 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/2010. (Verduzco, M)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Emerald Engergy 27 . Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/19/2010. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/19/2010. (Herman, H)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Striking 18 Answer and Directing Defendant Emerald Energy, LLC, to Retain Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/2010. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Emerald Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John King
Represented By: Jennifer Tamar Poochigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?