AE v. County of Tulare et al
Plaintiff: AE
Defendant: County of Tulare, Tulare County Health and Human Services Agency, Tulare County Child Welfare Services, Celeste Abarca, Patricia Negrette, Yadira Portillo, Prudence Morris, Helen Rue, Courtney Wampler, Cwa Felix, Heidi Williams, Soto, Adrian Marquez, Tiffany Breen, Leticia Quezada, Marie Focha, Miriam Sallam and Family Builders Foster Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02204
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 224 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Approval of Minor's Settlement. Matter is referred to Judge O"Neill; signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2012. (Hernandez, M)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/11/2012.(Case Management Deadline: 8/23/2012) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/11/2012 granting 178 Request to Seal Documents. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER on Dispositive Motions 170 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/18/12: Dispositive Motion papers to be filed no later than June 6, 2012; Opposition papers to dispositive motions to be filed no later than June 20, 2012; and Reply papers for dispositive motions to be filed no later than June 27, 2012. (Hellings, J.)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION of the Parties to Continue the Deadline For Expert Witness Disclosure and For the Filing and Hearing on Dispositive Motions and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/10/2012. (Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline is continued to 4/23/2012, Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline is continued to 5/7/2012, Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline is continued to 5/23/2012, and Dispositive Motion Hearing date is continued to 6/9/2012.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue discovery deadlines and expert discovery as follows: Expert Witness Disclosure extended to 4/10/2012; Discovery Cut off extended to 4/10/2012; Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure extended to 4/23/2012; Expert Discovery Cutoff extended to 5/10/2012. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/22/2012. (Hernandez, M)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline for Expert Disclosure, Supplemental Disclosure of Expert and Continue the Deadline for Completion of Expert Discovery ; ORDER Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/23/2012. (Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/20/2012; Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses Deadline: 3/12/2012; Expert Discovery due by 4/2/2012) (Figueroa, O)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER on Summary Decision 141 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/12/12: This Court GRANTS summary judgment for Defendants; The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment against Plaintiff AE and in favor of Defendants Tulare Youth Service Bureau, Inc. and Adrain Marquez; The Clerk is DIRECTED NOT to close this action. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER SEALING Exhibits B, C, and D filed In Support of Defendants: Tulare Youth Service Bureau, Inc. and Adrain Marquez' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/21/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION of the parties to continue settlement conference; and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/6/2011. (Settlement Conference previously set for 12/14/2011 has been CONTINUED to 2/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 24, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/29/2011 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/12/2011. (Hernandez, M)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to File Third-Party Complaint 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/20/11: Defendants SHALL file the Third-Party Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION Of The Parties Consenting To Continue Discovery Deadlines, Settlement Conference And Trial Date; And ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/15/2011. (Dispositive Motions filed by 4/23/2012, Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlin e: 1/20/2012, Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 3/19/2012, Jury Trial set for 9/17/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.) (Fahrney, E)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER on Defendant Ceballos' F.R.CivP. 12 Motions to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/2/2011. This court DISMISSES with leave to amend the claims against Ms. Ceballos; ORDERS AE, no later than June 17, 2011, to file either a fifth amended complaint or papers to voluntarily dismiss Ms. Ceballos. (Marrujo, C)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to File Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/18/2011. (Figueroa, O)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING 89 Defendant's Motion to file Third-Party Complaint without prejudice. Order requiring plaintiff to serve defendants Williams, Puentes and Ceballos within 60 days. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/18/2011. (Hernandez, M)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION of the parties to allow Movant to file Amended Motion for leave to file Third-Party Complaint impleading Third Party Defendant and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/7/2011. (Figueroa, O)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/10/2010 re 84 Request. Defendant, Family Builders Foster Care, Inc. is dismissed. (Lundstrom, T)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/7/2010. Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON TULARE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' F.R.Civ.P. 12 MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT 72 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 6, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for July 12, 2010 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER on Tulare Youth Defendants' F.R.Civ.P. 12 Motion to Dismiss 70 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/11/2010. (Arellano, S.)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on 46 Tulare County Defendants' F.R.Civ.P. 12 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/14/2010. THE COURT ORDERS: This action against Defendants Tulare County, Prudence Morris, Patricia Negrette, Marie Fo cha, Crystal Soto, M.D., Celeste Abarca, Tiffany Pryor, and Miriam Sallam is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff AE is ORDERED to file and serve either a Second Amended Complaint OR a Statement indicating that Plaintiff does not seek to pursue claims against the remaining defendants, no later than 4/30/2010. (Jessen, A)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 4/27/2010 to 6/22/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/8/2010. (Hernandez, M)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER On Defendant Family Builders Foster Care, Inc.'s F.R. Civ.P. 12 Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 44 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/6/2010. This Court: DISMISSES with leave to amend the FAC's (first) deliberate indifference and (second) negligence claims as to Family Builders; and DISMISSES with prejudice the FAC's (third) defamation and slander and (fourth) invasion of privacy claims. (Scrivner, E)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the due date of the responsive pleading for Defendants Tulare Youth Service Bureau and Adrain Marquez signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/3/2010. Response to Plaintiff's complaint is due on or before May 3, 2010.(Timken, A)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 3/18/2010 to 4/27/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before 3/10/2010 - Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/3/2010. (Hernandez, M)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Application of Maribel Hernandez to be Appointed Guardian Ad Litem For Minor AE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/21/2009. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AE v. County of Tulare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AE
Represented By: Daniel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Health and Human Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Child Welfare Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Negrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yadira Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudence Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cwa Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Focha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Sallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Builders Foster Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?