Wright v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Yisrael Wright
Defendant: Smith, Bell, Gonzales, Miller, Paul, Dreher and L Mettry
Case Number: 1:2010cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 68 Request to Modify Scheduling Order to Continue Dispositive Motions Deadline and Continue Deposition Date of Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/19/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 50 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED re 10 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Defendants' 64 Request to Modify Scheduling Order to Continue Dispositive Motions Deadline and Continue Deposition Date of Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/2/14. New Deadline for Plaintiff's Deposition: 05/23/15; New Deadline for Dispositive Motions: 7/27/2015. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request to Modify Scheduling Order 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/4/14: New Dispositive Motions Deadline set for March 2, 2015. (Hellings, J)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request to Modify Scheduling Order for Limited Purpose, to Continue Deposition Date of Plaintiff 60 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/11/14: New discovery deadline: January 16, 2015. (Hellings, J)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADDRESSING 56 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification and Assistance signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/3/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 Defendants' Request to Extend Discovery Deadline for Limited Purpose Discussed by this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/30/2014. New Discovery Deadline: 9/8/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 51 Defendants' Request and ORDER Directing Clerk to Substitute Redacted Version of Exhibit re 50 & 51 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/11/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER adopting 39 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss and ordering defendants to file answer signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/25/2013. ( Filing Deadline: 10/28/2013).(Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re 10 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/18/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/21/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/2012. (Jessen, A)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Free Copies Under One-Time Exception re 20 and ORDER Directing Clerk to Process Plaintiff's Service Documents to Enable Service Documents to Enable Service of Process by United States Marshal signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/18/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER In Response to 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Declaration Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/4/2012 for plaintiff to submit additional documents required for service of process. (Case Management Deadline: 2/8/2012). (Lundstrom, T)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Attach and Incorporate Pages to First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/27/2011. (Marrujo, C)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2010. (Amended Complaint form sent with this order)(Amended Complaint due by 1/18/2011) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Yisrael Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreher
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Mettry
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?