Garcia v. Noll
Petitioner: Salvador Garcia
Respondent: C Noll
Case Number: 1:2010cv00140
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 20 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; DIRECTING Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Respondent; and DECLINING to issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/13/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 14 Request to Amend Petition, DIRECTING Petitioner to File Amended Petition Within Thirty Days, and DIRECTING Respondent to File Supplemental Response to Amended Petition When Filed signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/14/2010. Filing Deadline: 5/18/2010. (Bradley, A)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/8/10. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:09-cv-3297 CMK HC) to Fresno (1:10-cv-0140 DLB HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/27/2010. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salvador Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?