Salcido v. Madera County et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Salcido
Defendant: The County of Madera, Jeffery Thomas, Patrick Majeski, Mathew Kutz, S. Strizel, Mark Schafer, Brian Cutler, Ian Weaver and DOES 1 to 50
Case Number: 1:2010cv00195
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/10/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause, Resetting Pre-trial Conference, and requiring parties to meet and confer, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/6/2012. (Joint Pre-Trial Statement Deadline: 9/12/2012; Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER VACATING Pre-Trial conference and ORDER to Show Cause, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2012. (Response due by 9/10/201) (Figueroa, O)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/2012. (Kusamura, W)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING February 7, 2011 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission (re 24 , 25 Motion to Dismiss), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/2/2011. (Arellano, S.)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint With Leave to Amend, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/16/2010. Amended Complaint due by 12/7/2010. (Jessen, A)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem 18 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/20/10. (Hellings, J)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STAYING All Proceedings and Pending Motions in This Case re 11 , 14 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/13/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's counsel shall file a motion for the appointment of a guardian ad litem by the Court that complies with Local Rule 202, on or by September 2, 2010; All proceedings and pending motions in this case are stayed until the guardian ad litem issue is resolved.(Bradley, A)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING July 19, 2010 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/13/2010. (Figueroa, O)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 5/11/2010 to 6/23/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. The parties shall submit a joint scheduling report one week before the conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/12/2010. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salcido v. Madera County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Salcido
Represented By: Karney Mark Mekhitarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Madera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Majeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Kutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Strizel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?