Jones v. Harrington

Petitioner: Jason Earl Jones
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Case Number: 1:2010cv00212
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Respondent's 20 MOTION to DISMISS be GRANTED and the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further RECOMMENDS that the Clerk be DIRECTED to enter judgment for Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2010, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 1/18/2011 (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/24/2010. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the petition should not be dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/12/2010. Petitioner is DIRECTED to submit a copy of his Rules Violation Report with his response. (Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2010.)(Marrujo, C)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jason Earl Jones, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/9/10. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED because the petition does not allege grounds that would entitle Petitioner to habeas corpus relief and that the Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to send Petitioner the standard form for claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/4/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 4/6/2010. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Earl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?